|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6755.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5051.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5264.).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|