LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2062
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2062
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2062
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 23, 2012
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 11, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 24, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 13, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 25, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 24, 2012
Compare