LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2062
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2062
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2062
Compare Versions
AB2062 Chaptered September 24, 2012
AB2062 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2062 Amended August 13, 2012
AB2062 Amended May 25, 2012
AB2062 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2062 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2062 Chaptered September 24, 2012
AB2062 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2062 Amended August 13, 2012
AB2062 Amended May 25, 2012
AB2062 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2062 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare