|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 459, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 2902.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2208.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1568.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|