California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011