LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB212
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB212
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB212
Compare Versions
AB212 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB212 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB212 Amended August 30, 2011
AB212 Amended August 15, 2011
AB212 Amended June 21, 2011
AB212 Amended March 29, 2011
AB212 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB212 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB212 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB212 Amended August 30, 2011
AB212 Amended August 15, 2011
AB212 Amended June 21, 2011
AB212 Amended March 29, 2011
AB212 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare