|
09/27/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6092.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4573.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 1389.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|