LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB217
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB217
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB217
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 31, 2011
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 27, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
July 2, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 7, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 25, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 8, 2011
Compare