LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB217
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB217
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB217
Compare Versions
AB217 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB217 Amended July 2, 2012
AB217 Amended April 7, 2011
AB217 Amended March 25, 2011
AB217 Amended March 8, 2011
AB217 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB217 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB217 Amended July 2, 2012
AB217 Amended April 7, 2011
AB217 Amended March 25, 2011
AB217 Amended March 8, 2011
AB217 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare