|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4590.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5037.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|