LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2187
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2187
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2187
Compare Versions
AB2187 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB2187 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB2187 Amended May 1, 2012
AB2187 Amended April 17, 2012
AB2187 Amended March 26, 2012
AB2187 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2187 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB2187 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB2187 Amended May 1, 2012
AB2187 Amended April 17, 2012
AB2187 Amended March 26, 2012
AB2187 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare