California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2187 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill March 26, 2012