|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 3124.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 2396.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 1458.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1351.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|