California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill May 12, 2011
Bill March 8, 2011