LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB22
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB22
Compare Versions
AB22 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB22 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB22 Amended September 1, 2011
AB22 Amended May 12, 2011
AB22 Amended March 8, 2011
AB22 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB22 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB22 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB22 Amended September 1, 2011
AB22 Amended May 12, 2011
AB22 Amended March 8, 2011
AB22 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare