|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4781.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5144.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|