BILL NUMBER: AB 2285CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 372 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 19, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 30, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Eng FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 13510.4 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officer training. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2285, Eng. Peace officer testing: cheating. Existing law requires the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training to establish a certification program for peace officers and for the Department of the California Highway Patrol and to establish minimum standards relating to physical, mental, and moral fitness for peace officers, as specified. This bill would make a peace officer trainee, as defined, who knowingly cheats, assists in cheating, or aids, abets, or knowingly conceals efforts by others to cheat in any manner on a basic course examination mandated by the commission liable for a fine of not more than $1,000 per occurrence. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13510.4 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 13510.4. (a) A peace officer trainee who, based on the commission' s investigative findings, knowingly cheats, assists in cheating, or aids, abets, or knowingly conceals efforts by others to cheat in any manner on a basic course examination mandated by the commission shall be liable for a civil fine of not more than one thousand dollars ($1,000) per occurrence. (b) For purposes of this section, "cheating" means any attempt or act by a peace officer trainee to gain an unfair advantage or give an unfair advantage to another peace officer trainee or group of trainees taking a POST-mandated basic course examination. (c) For purposes of this section, "peace officer trainee" means an applicant for a basic course examination who has not been hired by a department or agency and who has not been sworn as a peace officer.