California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill May 23, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012