|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2181.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1573.).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1240.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|