California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB23 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/25/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 23CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 91 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 25, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 25, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 27, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Smyth DECEMBER 6, 2010 An act to add Section 54952.3 to the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 23, Smyth. Local agency meetings: simultaneous meetings: compensation disclosure. Existing law, the Ralph M. Brown Act, requires each legislative body of a local agency to provide the time and place for holding regular meetings and requires that all meetings of a legislative body be open and public and all persons be permitted to attend unless a closed session is authorized. This bill would authorize a convened legislative body whose membership constitutes a quorum of any other legislative body to convene a meeting of the subsequent legislative body, simultaneously or in serial order, only if a clerk or member of the convened legislative body verbally announces the amount of compensation or stipend, if any, that each member will be entitled to receive as a result of convening the simultaneous or serial meeting of the subsequent legislative body, and that the compensation or stipend shall be provided as a result of convening a meeting for which each member is entitled to collect compensation or a stipend, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 54952.3 is added to the Government Code, to read: 54952.3. (a) A legislative body that has convened a meeting and whose membership constitutes a quorum of any other legislative body may convene a meeting of that other legislative body, simultaneously or in serial order, only if a clerk or a member of the convened legislative body verbally announces, prior to convening any simultaneous or serial order meeting of that subsequent legislative body, the amount of compensation or stipend, if any, that each member will be entitled to receive as a result of convening the simultaneous or serial meeting of the subsequent legislative body and identifies that the compensation or stipend shall be provided as a result of convening a meeting for which each member is entitled to collect compensation or a stipend. However, the clerk or member of the legislative body shall not be required to announce the amount of compensation if the amount of compensation is prescribed in statute and no additional compensation has been authorized by a local agency. (b) For purposes of this section, compensation and stipend shall not include amounts reimbursed for actual and necessary expenses incurred by a member in the performance of the member's official duties, including, but not limited to, reimbursement of expenses relating to travel, meals, and lodging.