LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB23
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB23
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB23
Compare Versions
AB23 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB23 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB23 Amended June 9, 2011
AB23 Amended June 1, 2011
AB23 Amended April 14, 2011
AB23 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB23 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB23 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB23 Amended June 9, 2011
AB23 Amended June 1, 2011
AB23 Amended April 14, 2011
AB23 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare