|
09/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4472.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4890.)
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|