BILL NUMBER: AB 2383CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 304 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 13, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 13, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 13, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 17, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ammiano FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 1808.51 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2383, Ammiano. Vehicles: confidential records: access by certain public officials. Existing law requires that the Attorney General, district attorneys, law enforcement agencies, city attorneys prosecuting specified misdemeanor actions, public defenders, and public defender investigators have access, including, but not limited to, telephone access, to specified records of the Department of Motor Vehicles. Existing law requires a driver's license to bear a fullface engraved picture or photograph of the licensee and prohibits the department, unless requested by the licensee, from distributing or selling the licensee's picture or photograph or any information pertaining to the licensee's physical characteristics to any private individual, other than the licensee, or to any firm, copartnership, association, or corporation, except as specified. This bill would authorize the department to provide copies of fullface engraved pictures or photographs of individuals directly to a city attorney of a city and county and his or her investigators for purposes of performing functions related to city and county operations. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1808.51 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 1808.51. Notwithstanding Sections 1808.5 and 12800.5, both of the following may obtain copies of fullface engraved pictures or photographs of individuals directly from the department: (a) The Department of Real Estate, as a department, individually, or through its staff, for purposes of enforcing the Real Estate Law (Part 1 (commencing with Section 10000) of Division 4 of the Business and Professions Code) or the Subdivided Lands Law (Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 11000) of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Business and Professions Code). (b) The city attorney of a city and county and his or her investigators for purposes of performing functions related to city and county operations.