California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2012

Amended

Bill May 14, 2012
Bill March 26, 2012