|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 2903.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2202.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2078.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Vargas. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2084.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 1496.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|