LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB243
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB243
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB243
Compare Versions
AB243 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB243 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB243 Amended August 29, 2011
AB243 Amended April 4, 2011
AB243 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB243 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB243 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB243 Amended August 29, 2011
AB243 Amended April 4, 2011
AB243 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare