California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011