06/28/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 5058.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/01/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |