BILL NUMBER: AB 2589AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 30, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bradford FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act relating to automobile insurance. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2589, as amended, Bradford. Automobile insurance: underinsured motorist coverage: survey. Existing law prohibits a policy of bodily injury liability insurance covering liability arising out of the ownership, maintenance, or use of any motor vehicle from being issued or delivered in this state to the owner or operator of a motor vehicle, or from being issued or delivered by any insurer licensed in this state upon any motor vehicle then principally used or principally garaged in this state, unless the policy contains, or has added to it by endorsement, a provision with specified coverage limits insuring the insured, the insured's heirs, or legal representative for all sums within the limits that he, she, or they are legally entitled to recover as damages for bodily injury or wrongful death from the owner or operator of an uninsured motor vehicle, except as otherwise provided. Uninsured motorist coverage includes underinsured motorist coverage. This bill would require the CaliforniaResearch BureauLaw Revision Commission to conduct a survey to compare the key provisions of California's underinsured motorist coverage laws with the laws of other states, as specified. The bill would require thebureaucommission to conduct the survey in consultation with automobile insurers, consumer attorneys, and the Department of Insurance, and to report its findings to the Legislature no later than December 31, 2013. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) The CaliforniaResearch BureauLaw Revision Commission shall conduct a survey, as described in subdivision (b), in consultation with automobile insurers, consumer attorneys, and the Department of Insurance, and shall report its findings to the Legislature no later than December 31, 2013. (b) The survey required by subdivision (a) shall compare the key provisions of California's underinsured motorist coverage laws, as specified in Section 11580.2 of the Insurance Code, with the laws of each of the other states in the United States. (c) In addition to reporting the survey findings, the CaliforniaResearch BureauLaw Revision Commission shall include in its report to the Legislature a discussion concerning the extent of disclosure to California consumers about the operation of California's underinsured motorist coverage as compared to disclosures required by other states. (d) (1) The report required under this section shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on December 31, 2017.