California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2589 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill June 28, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012