|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 362, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6328.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4701.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4788.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was acted upon on or after April 9, 2012. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4478.)
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|