California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2688 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012