LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2688
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2688
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2688
Compare Versions
AB2688 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB2688 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2688 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2688 Amended June 26, 2012
AB2688 Amended June 18, 2012
AB2688 Introduced March 12, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2688 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB2688 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2688 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2688 Amended June 26, 2012
AB2688 Amended June 18, 2012
AB2688 Introduced March 12, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare