|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6620.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4977.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 27). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Measure version as amended on June 21 corrected.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1729.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|