California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011