LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB296
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB296
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB296
Compare Versions
AB296 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB296 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB296 Amended August 22, 2012
AB296 Amended August 21, 2012
AB296 Amended June 21, 2011
AB296 Amended May 27, 2011
AB296 Amended April 25, 2011
AB296 Amended March 31, 2011
AB296 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB296 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB296 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB296 Amended August 22, 2012
AB296 Amended August 21, 2012
AB296 Amended June 21, 2011
AB296 Amended May 27, 2011
AB296 Amended April 25, 2011
AB296 Amended March 31, 2011
AB296 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare