|
09/12/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5073.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly adopts Conference Committee report. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 6733.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From Conference Committee: Be adopted. Assembly (Ayes 2 (Allen and Furutani). Noes 0.). Senate (Ayes 2 (Negrete McLeod and Simitian. Noes 0.). To print.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2011
|
Assembly Members Allen, Furutani, and Silva appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2011
|
Senators Negrete McLeod, Simitian, and Walters appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 75. Page 3210.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2422.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 2. Page 2338.)
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1781.).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1339.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|