LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB340
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB340
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB340
Compare Versions
AB340 Chaptered September 12, 2012
AB340 Enrolled September 5, 2012
AB340 Amended August 28, 2012
AB340 Amended September 7, 2011
AB340 Amended September 2, 2011
AB340 Amended June 22, 2011
AB340 Amended April 25, 2011
AB340 Amended April 14, 2011
AB340 Amended April 11, 2011
AB340 Amended February 24, 2011
AB340 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB340 Chaptered September 12, 2012
AB340 Enrolled September 5, 2012
AB340 Amended August 28, 2012
AB340 Amended September 7, 2011
AB340 Amended September 2, 2011
AB340 Amended June 22, 2011
AB340 Amended April 25, 2011
AB340 Amended April 14, 2011
AB340 Amended April 11, 2011
AB340 Amended February 24, 2011
AB340 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare