California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2012

Amended

Bill August 28, 2012
Bill September 7, 2011
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011
Bill April 11, 2011
Bill February 24, 2011