|
07/10/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 75, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5416.).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4027.).
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pavley.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1127.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|