California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 10, 2012

Amended

Bill January 17, 2012
Bill March 30, 2011
Bill March 15, 2011
Bill March 7, 2011