LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB389
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB389
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB389
Compare Versions
AB389 Chaptered July 10, 2012
AB389 Enrolled June 26, 2012
AB389 Amended January 17, 2012
AB389 Amended March 30, 2011
AB389 Amended March 15, 2011
AB389 Amended March 7, 2011
AB389 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB389 Chaptered July 10, 2012
AB389 Enrolled June 26, 2012
AB389 Amended January 17, 2012
AB389 Amended March 30, 2011
AB389 Amended March 15, 2011
AB389 Amended March 7, 2011
AB389 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare