|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 387, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 6495.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 4589.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 1457.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1337.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|