LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB401
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB401
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB401
Compare Versions
AB401 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB401 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB401 Amended August 14, 2012
AB401 Amended May 9, 2012
AB401 Amended April 26, 2012
AB401 Amended May 12, 2011
AB401 Amended April 26, 2011
AB401 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB401 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB401 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB401 Amended August 14, 2012
AB401 Amended May 9, 2012
AB401 Amended April 26, 2012
AB401 Amended May 12, 2011
AB401 Amended April 26, 2011
AB401 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare