California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill May 9, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill May 12, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011