|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 3016.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2131.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 32. Page 1697.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1589.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|