California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB420 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill August 22, 2011
Bill August 16, 2011
Bill July 5, 2011
Bill June 14, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 15, 2011