BILL NUMBER: AB 420AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis ( Coauthors: Assembly Members Carter and Mitchell ) ( Coauthors: Senators Price and Wright ) FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to add Section 21003 to the Elections Code, relating to redistricting. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 420, as amended, Davis. Redistricting. Existing law, as added by constitutional initiative, establishes the Citizens Redistricting Commission, and charges it with various duties and responsibilities in connection with redistricting Assembly, Senate, Board of Equalization, and congressional districts, as specified. Existing law also requires various local government agencies to adjust their district boundaries following each decennial federal census. Existing law establishes the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, and charges it with various duties and responsibilities in connection with the incarceration and rehabilitation of prisoners, as specified. This bill would require the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to furnish to the Citizens Redistricting Commission and the Secretary of State , by December 31, 2018 2019 , specified information regarding the last known place of residence, as defined, of each inmate incarcerated in a state adult correctional facility, except as specified, and would further require the Secretary of State to furnish that information, by December 31, 2019, to each local government agency responsible for adjusting district boundaries an inmate whose last known place of residence is outside of California . The bill also would request the Citizens Redistricting Commission , and would require each local government agency that receives the above information, to deem each incarcerated person as residing at his or her last known place of residence, rather than at the institution of his or her incarceration, and to utilize the above information in carrying out its redistricting responsibilities. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 21003 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 21003. (a) (1) Not later than December 31, 2018 2019 , the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall furnish to the Citizens Redistricting Commission and the Secretary of State information regarding the last known place of residence of each inmate incarcerated in a state adult correctional facility, except an inmate who is a foreign national or whose last known place of residence is outside of California. (2) Not later than December 31, 2019, the Secretary of State shall furnish the information described in paragraph (1) to each local government agency responsible for adjusting district boundaries under this division. (2) The information furnished by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation pursuant to paragraph (1) shall include, for each inmate, a unique identifier, other than the inmate's name or Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation number, and last known address information that is sufficiently specific to determine the congressional, State Senatorial, State Assembly, or State Board of Equalization district in which the inmate's last known place of residence is located. This information may include, but not be limited to, ZIP Code information or street address information from which a ZIP Code can be derived. (b) Consistent with Section 2025, the Legislature hereby requests the Citizens Redistricting Commission to deem each incarcerated person as residing at his or her last known place of residence, rather than at the institution of his or her incarceration, and to utilize the information furnished to it pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) in carrying out its redistricting responsibilities under Article XXI of the California Constitution. (c) Consistent with Section 2025, each local government agency responsible for adjusting district boundaries under this division shall deem each incarcerated person as residing at his or her last known place of residence, rather than at the institution of his or her incarceration, and shall utilize the information furnished to it pursuant to paragraph (2) of subdivision (a) in carrying out its redistricting responsibilities under this division. (d) (c) For purposes of this section, "last known place of residence" means the address at which the inmate was last domiciled prior to his or her current term of incarceration, as determined from the court records of the county in which the inmate was sentenced to his or her current term of incarceration.