LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB420
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB420
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB420
Compare Versions
AB420 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB420 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB420 Amended August 22, 2011
AB420 Amended August 16, 2011
AB420 Amended July 5, 2011
AB420 Amended June 14, 2011
AB420 Amended May 27, 2011
AB420 Amended April 15, 2011
AB420 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB420 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB420 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB420 Amended August 22, 2011
AB420 Amended August 16, 2011
AB420 Amended July 5, 2011
AB420 Amended June 14, 2011
AB420 Amended May 27, 2011
AB420 Amended April 15, 2011
AB420 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare