|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2722.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2083.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1341.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|